ASX/NZX - SSH Notice - Matthews International Capital Management, LLC
Disclosure of ceasing to have substantial holding
Section 279, Financial Markets Conduct Act 2013
Note: This form must be completed in accordance with the instructions at the end of the form.
To NZX Limited
and
To SKYCITY Entertainment Group Limited
Date this disclosure made: December 30, 2015
Date last disclosure made: August 26, 2015
Date on which substantial holding ceased: December 30, 2015
Substantial product holder(s) giving disclosure
Full name(s): Matthews International Capital Management, LLC (“MICM”)
Summary of previous substantial holding
Class of quoted voting products: Ordinary shares
Summary for MIF:
For last disclosure,—
(a) total number held in class: 29,800,862
(b) total in class: 587,472,741
(c) total percentage held in class: 5.07%
For current holding after ceasing to have substantial holding,—
(a) total number held in class: 28,575,587
(b) total in class: 593,030,574
(c) total percentage held in class: 4.82%
Details of transactions and events giving rise to ceasing of substantial holding
Details of the transactions or other events requiring disclosure: [specify details required by the instructions to this form]
Transaction Type |
Date |
Shares/Units |
Consideration (NZD) |
Purchase |
27 August 2015 |
451,211 ordinary shares |
$1,806,874.45 |
Purchase |
12 October 2015 |
100,000 ordinary shares |
$396,000.00 |
Purchase |
13 October 2015 |
450,000 ordinary share |
$1,794,510.00 |
Purchase |
14 October 2015 |
337,411 ordinary shares |
$1,346,269.89 |
Sale |
22 December 2015 |
201,945 ordinary shares |
$867,313.39 |
Sale |
23 December 2015 |
550,000 ordinary shares |
$s,365,990.00 |
Sale |
29 December 2015 |
650,000 ordinary shares |
$2,793,985.00 |
Sale |
30 December 2015 |
1,161,952 ordinary shares |
$5,018,805.15 |
Additional information:
Address(es) of substantial product holder(s): 4 Embarcadero Center, Suite 550, San Francisco, CA 94111 U.S.A.
Contact details: Manoj K. Pombra, Chief Compliance Officer. Phone 415-955-8122. Email Tito.Pombra@MatthewsAsia.com.
Certification:
I, Manoj K. Pombra, certify that, to the best of my knowledge and belief, the information contained in this disclosure is correct and that I am duly authorised to make this disclosure by all persons for whom it is made.
/s/ Manoj K. Pombra
Manoj K. Pombra
Chief Compliance Officer
Matthews International Capital Management, LLC
Attachement: SSH Notice - Matthews International Capital Management, LLC
Back to Media Centre